U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00162
  • Case Name: Haileselassie v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2020
  • November 24, 2020: [USCA Mandate]
  • November 24, 2020: [USCA Opinion/Judgment]
October, 2020
  • October 08, 2020: [Letter]
  • October 07, 2020: [USCA Order]
  • October 07, 2020: [USCA Case Number]
  • October 05, 2020: [Notification of Appeal to USCA]
September, 2020
  • September 18, 2020: [Notice of Appeal]
  • September 15, 2020: [Letter]
  • September 08, 2020: [Affidavit]
  • September 08, 2020: [Letter]
  • September 04, 2020: [Judgment]
  • September 03, 2020: [Order]
  • September 03, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
August, 2020
  • August 07, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 03, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2020
  • July 16, 2020: [Brief /Other]
  • July 10, 2020: [Hearing/Oral Argument]
  • July 10, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
June, 2020
  • June 25, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 15, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • June 08, 2020: [Letter]
May, 2020
  • May 26, 2020: [Order]
  • May 26, 2020: [Letter]
  • May 22, 2020: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence - 2255]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.