U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:20-cv-04018
  • Case Name: Scottsdale Insurance Company v. 59 Power Sports, Inc et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2020
  • December 03, 2020: [Approve Consent Judgment]
November, 2020
  • November 20, 2020: [UNRESISTED Motion]
June, 2020
  • June 30, 2020: [UNRESISTED Motion]
  • June 24, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • June 22, 2020: [Judgment on the Pleadings]
  • June 19, 2020: [UNRESISTED Motion]
  • June 18, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 15, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • June 15, 2020: [UNRESISTED Motion]
  • June 01, 2020: [Stay]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.