U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cv-00011
  • Case Name: McEowen v. GoDaddy.com, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 09, 2021: [UNRESISTED Motion]
May, 2021
  • May 14, 2021: [UNRESISTED Motion]
  • May 04, 2021: [Seal Document]
  • May 04, 2021: [Sanctions]
  • May 04, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2021
  • April 07, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
March, 2021
  • March 12, 2021: [Leave to File Document]
February, 2021
  • February 26, 2021: [UNRESISTED Motion]
  • February 19, 2021: [UNRESISTED Motion]
  • February 12, 2021: [Extension of Time]
January, 2021
  • January 26, 2021: [Seal Document]
  • January 22, 2021: [Seal Document]
  • January 22, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
  • January 07, 2021: [Compel]
August, 2020
  • August 13, 2020: [Protective Order]
June, 2020
  • June 01, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.