U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00174
  • Case Name: Petefish v. Werner Enterprises, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2020
  • November 18, 2020: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • November 16, 2020: [Stipulation]
August, 2020
  • August 12, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • August 11, 2020: [Notice of Consent]
  • August 10, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • August 05, 2020: [Order]
  • August 05, 2020: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • August 05, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
July, 2020
  • July 30, 2020: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • July 29, 2020: [Notice - Other]
  • July 29, 2020: [Scheduling Conference]
  • July 29, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 22, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • July 16, 2020: [Order]
  • July 16, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • July 16, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
June, 2020
  • June 29, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • June 18, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • June 10, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • June 10, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
  • June 05, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • June 04, 2020: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.