U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-cv-00049
  • Case Name: Caldwell v. Wellmark Inc et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
  • April 02, 2021: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • April 02, 2021: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
  • April 02, 2021: [Status Report]
February, 2021
  • February 02, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • February 02, 2021: [Status Report]
January, 2021
  • January 04, 2021: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
December, 2020
  • December 21, 2020: [Order]
  • December 21, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • December 18, 2020: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • December 09, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 09, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • December 08, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 07, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 07, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • December 04, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [Reply]
  • November 25, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • November 11, 2020: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • November 06, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 05, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • November 05, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
October, 2020
  • October 22, 2020: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • October 22, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • October 22, 2020: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • October 22, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • October 22, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 15, 2020: [Reply]
  • October 13, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
September, 2020
  • September 23, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • September 22, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • September 21, 2020: [Summons Issued]
  • September 17, 2020: [Order]
  • September 17, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • September 17, 2020: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • September 17, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 15, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • September 14, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • September 11, 2020: [Scheduling Conference]
  • September 08, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 08, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • September 04, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • September 03, 2020: [Order]
  • September 03, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • September 02, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
August, 2020
  • August 27, 2020: [Joinder]
  • August 24, 2020: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • August 07, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • August 06, 2020: [Amended Complaint]
  • August 05, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • August 05, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
July, 2020
  • July 20, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
  • July 13, 2020: [Order]
June, 2020
  • June 29, 2020: [Reply]
  • June 25, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • June 24, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • June 11, 2020: [Joinder]
  • June 11, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • June 10, 2020: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • June 08, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • June 04, 2020: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.