U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00177
  • Case Name: Arias v. Cactus Farms, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2020
  • June 29, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • June 29, 2020: [Leave to File]
  • June 26, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • June 26, 2020: [Leave]
  • June 25, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • June 15, 2020: [Order]
  • June 15, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • June 12, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
  • June 08, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • June 05, 2020: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.