U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00186
  • Case Name: Toang v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2021
  • May 03, 2021: [USCA Mandate]
April, 2021
  • April 26, 2021: [USCA Order]
February, 2021
  • February 18, 2021: [USCA Opinion/Judgment]
November, 2020
  • November 03, 2020: [USCA Order]
  • November 03, 2020: [USCA Case Number]
October, 2020
  • October 30, 2020: [Notification of Appeal to USCA]
  • October 02, 2020: [Judgment]
  • October 01, 2020: [Order]
June, 2020
  • June 18, 2020: [Errata]
  • June 17, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • June 12, 2020: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence - 2255]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.