U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00190
  • Case Name: Hollingshed v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 16, 2021: [USCA Mandate]
September, 2021
  • September 23, 2021: [USCA Opinion/Judgment]
June, 2021
  • June 14, 2021: [LR 83E Exhibits]
  • June 11, 2021: [LR 83E Exhibits]
  • June 07, 2021: [USCA Order]
  • June 07, 2021: [USCA Case Number]
  • June 04, 2021: [Notification of Appeal to USCA]
  • June 03, 2021: [Notice of Appeal]
  • June 02, 2021: [Judgment]
  • June 01, 2021: [Order]
  • June 01, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
May, 2021
  • May 28, 2021: [Certificate of Service]
  • May 28, 2021: [Evidentiary Hearing]
  • May 24, 2021: [Order]
  • May 19, 2021: [Order]
  • May 19, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 12, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2021
  • March 18, 2021: [Order]
  • March 18, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
February, 2021
  • February 08, 2021: [Continue]
  • February 04, 2021: [Continue]
October, 2020
  • October 26, 2020: [Continue]
  • October 15, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
  • October 15, 2020: [Reconsideration]
September, 2020
  • September 22, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • September 17, 2020: [CJA Attorney Appointment]
  • September 16, 2020: [Order]
  • September 16, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • September 10, 2020: [Order]
  • September 10, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
June, 2020
  • June 16, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • June 15, 2020: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence - 2255]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.