U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00193
  • Case Name: Mrvjolak v. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 06, 2021: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • October 05, 2021: [Stipulation]
July, 2021
  • July 07, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
June, 2021
  • June 25, 2021: [Designation of Expert Witnesses]
May, 2021
  • May 14, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [Compel]
  • March 04, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • March 02, 2021: [Status Conference]
February, 2021
  • February 18, 2021: [Declaration]
  • February 18, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • February 18, 2021: [Compel]
  • February 15, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
August, 2020
  • August 18, 2020: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • August 13, 2020: [Order]
  • August 13, 2020: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • August 13, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • August 12, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • August 11, 2020: [Order]
July, 2020
  • July 30, 2020: [Scheduling Conference]
  • July 30, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 27, 2020: [Protective Order]
  • July 27, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • July 20, 2020: [Order]
  • July 20, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
June, 2020
  • June 23, 2020: [Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal]
  • June 18, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • June 18, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • June 17, 2020: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.