U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-cv-00053
  • Case Name: Sharp v. Berstler
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 20, 2021: [USCA Order]
August, 2021
  • August 26, 2021: [USCA Mandate]
  • August 26, 2021: [USCA Opinion/Judgment]
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [USCA Order]
June, 2021
  • June 28, 2021: [USCA Order]
May, 2021
  • May 12, 2021: [USCA Order]
April, 2021
  • April 14, 2021: [USCA Order]
February, 2021
  • February 25, 2021: [USCA Order]
  • February 24, 2021: [USCA Order]
January, 2021
  • January 29, 2021: [USCA Order]
  • January 29, 2021: [USCA Case Number]
  • January 27, 2021: [Notification of Appeal to USCA]
  • January 04, 2021: [Notice of Appeal]
December, 2020
  • December 10, 2020: [Judgment]
  • December 09, 2020: [Dismiss]
  • December 09, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2020
  • October 07, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
September, 2020
  • September 24, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 14, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • September 02, 2020: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • September 02, 2020: [Dismiss]
August, 2020
  • August 31, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
June, 2020
  • June 22, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • June 22, 2020: [Filing Fee Received]
  • June 19, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.