U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cv-00052
  • Case Name: Salata-Hill et al v. Copp
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2020
  • November 02, 2020: [UNRESISTED Motion]
August, 2020
  • August 13, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
July, 2020
  • July 27, 2020: [UNRESISTED Motion]
June, 2020
  • June 25, 2020: [UNRESISTED Motion]
  • June 25, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 22, 2020: [Change Venue]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.