U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00198
  • Case Name: Gamblin et al v. Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2020
  • October 02, 2020: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • October 02, 2020: [Brief /Other]
August, 2020
  • August 27, 2020: [Notice - Other]
  • August 20, 2020: [Notice - Other]
  • August 03, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • August 03, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
July, 2020
  • July 30, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • July 23, 2020: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • July 22, 2020: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • July 22, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • July 10, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • July 08, 2020: [Certificate of Service]
June, 2020
  • June 24, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • June 23, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.