U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00201
  • Case Name: Nash v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2020
  • December 29, 2020: [Notice - Other]
  • December 22, 2020: [Notice - Other]
September, 2020
  • September 08, 2020: [Supplement/Addendum]
  • September 08, 2020: [Show Cause]
  • September 03, 2020: [Supplement/Addendum]
August, 2020
  • August 31, 2020: [Show Cause]
  • August 05, 2020: [Judgment]
  • August 04, 2020: [Order]
July, 2020
  • July 08, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
June, 2020
  • June 29, 2020: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence - 2255]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.