U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:20-cv-04031
  • Case Name: Christensen v. Sergeant Bluff, City of et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2021
  • January 29, 2021: [File Overlength Brief]
  • January 22, 2021: [UNRESISTED Motion]
  • January 22, 2021: [File Overlength Brief]
December, 2020
  • December 24, 2020: [UNRESISTED Motion]
  • December 22, 2020: [File Overlength Brief]
  • December 22, 2020: [Summary Judgment]
October, 2020
  • October 12, 2020: [Leave to File Document]
July, 2020
  • July 02, 2020: [Continue Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.