U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00215
  • Case Name: Swain v. Life Insurance Company of North America et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • November 25, 2020: [Stipulation]
October, 2020
  • October 13, 2020: [Settlement Conference]
September, 2020
  • September 17, 2020: [Order]
  • September 17, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • September 17, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • September 08, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • September 08, 2020: [Stay]
  • September 01, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • September 01, 2020: [Scheduling Conference]
August, 2020
  • August 28, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • August 25, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • August 20, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • August 18, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • August 18, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • August 14, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • August 14, 2020: [Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal]
  • August 14, 2020: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • August 13, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • August 11, 2020: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
  • August 11, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • August 07, 2020: [Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal]
  • August 06, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 04, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • August 03, 2020: [Order]
  • August 03, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
July, 2020
  • July 31, 2020: [Crossclaim]
  • July 31, 2020: [Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal]
  • July 31, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • July 31, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • July 30, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • July 17, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • July 15, 2020: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • July 15, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • July 13, 2020: [Notice of Consent]
  • July 13, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • July 10, 2020: [Notice of Consent]
  • July 10, 2020: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.