U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-cv-00058
  • Case Name: Wilson v. Walmart Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2020
  • December 22, 2020: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • December 21, 2020: [Stipulation]
  • December 03, 2020: [Order]
  • December 03, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • December 03, 2020: [Status Report]
October, 2020
  • October 05, 2020: [Order]
  • October 05, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • October 02, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
July, 2020
  • July 29, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • July 27, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
  • July 21, 2020: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 20, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • July 14, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • July 13, 2020: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.