U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-cv-00059
  • Case Name: Slaton v. Climax Molybdenum Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 09, 2021: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • November 08, 2021: [Notice of Stipulated Dismissal]
October, 2021
  • October 12, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 12, 2021: [Closing Documents]
  • October 12, 2021: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • October 08, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • October 08, 2021: [Reply]
  • October 03, 2021: [In Limine]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [Brief /Other]
  • September 27, 2021: [In Limine]
  • September 22, 2021: [Order]
  • September 13, 2021: [Telephone Conference]
  • September 08, 2021: [Settlement Conference]
August, 2021
  • August 26, 2021: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • August 18, 2021: [Order]
  • August 18, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • August 09, 2021: [Order]
  • August 09, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [Settlement/Settlement Conference]
  • July 29, 2021: [Settlement/Settlement Conference]
  • July 29, 2021: [Sealed Motion]
  • July 27, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • July 26, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • July 12, 2021: [Quash]
  • July 02, 2021: [Reply]
June, 2021
  • June 28, 2021: [Leave to File]
  • June 25, 2021: [Leave]
  • June 25, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • June 23, 2021: [Reply]
  • June 16, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • June 04, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 03, 2021: [Seal]
  • June 01, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
May, 2021
  • May 21, 2021: [Compel]
  • May 20, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
  • May 17, 2021: [Quash]
  • May 11, 2021: [Order]
  • May 11, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • May 07, 2021: [Reply]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • April 16, 2021: [Compel]
  • April 14, 2021: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • April 07, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • April 07, 2021: [Errata]
  • April 06, 2021: [Protective Order]
February, 2021
  • February 22, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • February 22, 2021: [Order]
  • February 19, 2021: [Notice - Other]
January, 2021
  • January 29, 2021: [Compel]
  • January 21, 2021: [Order]
  • January 13, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
December, 2020
  • December 30, 2020: [Compel]
  • December 22, 2020: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • December 08, 2020: [Amended Complaint]
  • December 07, 2020: [Leave to File]
  • December 07, 2020: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • December 04, 2020: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
November, 2020
  • November 20, 2020: [Leave]
  • November 12, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 12, 2020: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • November 11, 2020: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
September, 2020
  • September 25, 2020: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • September 24, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • September 24, 2020: [Order]
  • September 23, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
August, 2020
  • August 06, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • August 05, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • August 05, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • August 05, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
  • August 05, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
July, 2020
  • July 23, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • July 21, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • July 16, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 15, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • July 15, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • July 14, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.