U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00221
  • Case Name: Kirkland v. Teeter
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • February 23, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • February 14, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • February 07, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
January, 2022
  • January 05, 2022: [Closing Documents]
  • January 05, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
December, 2021
  • December 20, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
July, 2021
  • July 14, 2021: [Reply]
  • July 12, 2021: [File Overlength Brief]
  • July 06, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • July 01, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • July 01, 2021: [Brief /Other]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [File Overlength Brief]
  • June 29, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • June 29, 2021: [File Overlength Brief]
  • June 25, 2021: [Supplement/Addendum]
  • June 24, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 24, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • June 22, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2021
  • May 24, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • May 18, 2021: [Status Report]
  • May 13, 2021: [Status Report Order]
  • May 11, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • May 06, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • May 04, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
April, 2021
  • April 20, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
March, 2021
  • March 12, 2021: [Status Conference]
February, 2021
  • February 22, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • February 19, 2021: [Protective Order]
October, 2020
  • October 02, 2020: [Order]
  • October 02, 2020: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • October 02, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • October 01, 2020: [Scheduling Conference]
  • October 01, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
September, 2020
  • September 28, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • September 18, 2020: [Order]
  • September 18, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • September 17, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
July, 2020
  • July 27, 2020: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • July 23, 2020: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • July 21, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • July 16, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • July 15, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.