U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00230
  • Case Name: The Kessler Enterprise, Inc. v. The Bohemian IC, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2020
  • August 25, 2020: [Report Regarding Patent & Trademark]
  • August 17, 2020: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • August 14, 2020: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
  • August 14, 2020: [Dismiss]
July, 2020
  • July 27, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 27, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • July 24, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • July 24, 2020: [Report Regarding Patent & Trademark]
  • July 23, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.