U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00238
  • Case Name: Bullock v. Miller et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 15, 2022: [Brief /Other]
October, 2022
  • October 05, 2022: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • October 05, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
September, 2022
  • September 21, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 21, 2022: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
August, 2022
  • August 19, 2022: [Substitute Attorney]
  • August 12, 2022: [Substitute Attorney]
December, 2021
  • December 03, 2021: [Order Staying Case]
  • December 01, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Brief /Other]
  • November 09, 2021: [Setting Hearing on Motion]
October, 2021
  • October 15, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • October 11, 2021: [Notice - Other]
  • October 01, 2021: [Reply]
September, 2021
  • September 24, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • September 24, 2021: [Compel]
  • September 17, 2021: [Reply]
  • September 10, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • September 10, 2021: [In Limine]
August, 2021
  • August 27, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • August 20, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
  • August 13, 2021: [Compel]
  • August 02, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 15, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 15, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • July 14, 2021: [Order]
  • July 06, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
June, 2021
  • June 01, 2021: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
May, 2021
  • May 20, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
  • May 19, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • May 17, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
February, 2021
  • February 24, 2021: [Order]
  • February 24, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • February 22, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • February 22, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 19, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2021
  • January 22, 2021: [Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines]
  • January 21, 2021: [Order]
  • January 21, 2021: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • January 21, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • January 20, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [Order]
  • November 30, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 23, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • November 20, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • November 20, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
September, 2020
  • September 25, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • September 22, 2020: [Order]
August, 2020
  • August 31, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • August 03, 2020: [Add and Terminate Judges]
July, 2020
  • July 31, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.