U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00237
  • Case Name: Harris v. NAPCO, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2021
  • February 12, 2021: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • February 11, 2021: [Sealed Motion]
  • February 08, 2021: [Leave to File Under Seal]
January, 2021
  • January 26, 2021: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • January 26, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • January 15, 2021: [Stipulation]
October, 2020
  • October 16, 2020: [Protective Order]
September, 2020
  • September 25, 2020: [Protective Order]
  • September 21, 2020: [Order]
  • September 21, 2020: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • September 21, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • September 16, 2020: [Scheduling Conference]
  • September 16, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 11, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • September 03, 2020: [Order]
  • September 03, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
August, 2020
  • August 31, 2020: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • August 20, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • August 17, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • August 17, 2020: [Amended Complaint]
  • August 14, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
  • August 07, 2020: [Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal]
  • August 04, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
July, 2020
  • July 31, 2020: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.