U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cv-00026
  • Case Name: Boardman et al v. Castro et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2020
  • December 22, 2020: [Substitute Party]
  • December 21, 2020: [Substitute Attorney]
  • December 17, 2020: [Substitute Attorney]
  • December 11, 2020: [Substitute Party]
  • December 03, 2020: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • December 02, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • December 02, 2020: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • December 02, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • December 02, 2020: [Order]
  • December 01, 2020: [Errata]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • November 25, 2020: [Notice of Dismissal R16/Service - Clerk]
August, 2020
  • August 17, 2020: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
  • August 11, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
  • August 07, 2020: [Show Cause]
  • August 03, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
July, 2020
  • July 31, 2020: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.