U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00242
  • Case Name: Mascheri et al v. Webb et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2021
  • January 19, 2021: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • January 15, 2021: [Notice of Stipulated Dismissal]
  • January 06, 2021: [Amended Answer to Complaint]
  • January 05, 2021: [Leave to File]
  • January 04, 2021: [Leave]
November, 2020
  • November 04, 2020: [Order]
  • November 04, 2020: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • November 04, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • November 03, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
August, 2020
  • August 17, 2020: [Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal]
  • August 03, 2020: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.