U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00173
  • Case Name: Rohlf v. Continental Casualty Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2021
  • January 20, 2021: [Judgment]
  • January 19, 2021: [Dismiss]
November, 2020
  • November 25, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
October, 2020
  • October 01, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 01, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
September, 2020
  • September 18, 2020: [Reply]
  • September 11, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
August, 2020
  • August 28, 2020: [Errata]
  • August 27, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • August 13, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • August 12, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • August 04, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.