open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

IOWA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa
    Case Number:4:20-cv-00243
    Party Name:Huff v. United States of America
  • Filing Type:Civil [Judgment]
    Date Published:August 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:August 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Errata]
    Date Published:August 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:August 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence - 2255]
    Date Published:August 04, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.iasd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?72862
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 3 =