U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-cv-00064
  • Case Name: Nsheiwat v. Walmart, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 11, 2025: [Transcript]
March, 2025
  • March 18, 2025: [Documents Sent]
  • March 14, 2025: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • March 14, 2025: [USCA Case Number]
  • March 13, 2025: [Notification of Appeal to USCA]
  • March 12, 2025: [Notice of Appeal]
November, 2024
  • November 15, 2024: [New Trial]
October, 2024
  • October 16, 2024: [Brief /Other]
  • October 10, 2024: [Order]
  • October 08, 2024: [Pretrial Conference - Interim]
  • October 04, 2024: [Leave]
  • October 04, 2024: [Proposed Pretrial Order]
  • October 03, 2024: [Leave to File]
  • October 03, 2024: [Leave]
  • October 02, 2024: [Proposed Pretrial Order]
  • October 02, 2024: [Exhibit List]
  • October 02, 2024: [Witness List]
  • October 02, 2024: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • October 01, 2024: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • October 01, 2024: [Transcript]
  • October 01, 2024: [Withdraw as Attorney]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • September 27, 2024: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • September 27, 2024: [Proposed Verdict Forms]
January, 2023
  • January 13, 2023: [Compel]
  • January 13, 2023: [Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
July, 2022
  • July 01, 2022: [Compel]
  • July 01, 2022: [Substitute Party]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Substitute Party]
  • June 23, 2022: [Continue]
  • June 23, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • June 17, 2022: [Continue]
  • June 17, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
  • June 10, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Compel]
April, 2022
  • April 04, 2022: [Transcript]
March, 2022
  • March 15, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 14, 2022: [Reply]
  • March 09, 2022: [Brief /Other]
  • March 01, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [Setting Hearing on Motion]
  • February 18, 2022: [Errata]
  • February 17, 2022: [Compel]
January, 2022
  • January 27, 2022: [Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines]
  • January 27, 2022: [Hearing/Oral Argument]
  • January 26, 2022: [Hearing/Oral Argument]
  • January 26, 2022: [Status Report]
December, 2021
  • December 28, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
September, 2021
  • September 16, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 16, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time re Transcript]
  • September 01, 2021: [Hearing/Oral Argument]
  • September 01, 2021: [Status Report]
July, 2021
  • July 20, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • July 07, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • July 06, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • July 06, 2021: [Status Report]
  • July 01, 2021: [Certificate of Service]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • June 09, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • June 08, 2021: [Protective Order]
April, 2021
  • April 29, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 29, 2021: [Add Party]
  • April 29, 2021: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
March, 2021
  • March 05, 2021: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
  • March 03, 2021: [Status Report]
January, 2021
  • January 25, 2021: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • January 23, 2021: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
  • January 05, 2021: [Status Conference]
November, 2020
  • November 04, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
September, 2020
  • September 02, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • September 02, 2020: [Order]
  • September 02, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • September 02, 2020: [Scheduling Conference]
  • September 01, 2020: [Errata]
August, 2020
  • August 26, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • August 26, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • August 13, 2020: [Order]
  • August 13, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • August 12, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • August 12, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
  • August 11, 2020: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.