U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00259
  • Case Name: Jones et al v. Lancaster Lumber, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • August 22, 2022: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
July, 2022
  • July 01, 2022: [Closing Documents]
  • July 01, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • July 01, 2022: [Notice of Settlement]
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Notice - Other]
  • June 27, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
  • June 16, 2022: [In Limine]
January, 2022
  • January 14, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • January 13, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 12, 2022: [Reply]
  • January 11, 2022: [File Overlength Brief]
  • January 11, 2022: [Reply]
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [Setting Hearing on Motion]
  • December 29, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • December 28, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • December 28, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • December 27, 2021: [File Overlength Brief]
  • December 08, 2021: [Errata]
  • December 06, 2021: [Brief /Other]
  • December 03, 2021: [File Overlength Brief]
  • December 03, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
  • December 03, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
September, 2021
  • September 23, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
August, 2021
  • August 04, 2021: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • August 04, 2021: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
March, 2021
  • March 23, 2021: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • March 23, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • March 19, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • March 18, 2021: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • March 18, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • March 11, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • March 05, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
January, 2021
  • January 27, 2021: [Certificate of Service]
  • January 21, 2021: [Amended Answer to Complaint]
  • January 21, 2021: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • January 20, 2021: [Leave to File]
  • January 20, 2021: [Leave]
November, 2020
  • November 10, 2020: [Certificate of Service]
October, 2020
  • October 09, 2020: [Order]
  • October 09, 2020: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • October 09, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • October 09, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 01, 2020: [Scheduling Conference]
  • October 01, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
September, 2020
  • September 30, 2020: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • September 29, 2020: [Order]
  • September 28, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • September 25, 2020: [Reply]
  • September 24, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • September 18, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • September 18, 2020: [Order]
  • September 18, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • September 15, 2020: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • September 15, 2020: [Brief /Other]
  • September 15, 2020: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • September 11, 2020: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • September 10, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 10, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • September 03, 2020: [Notice of Consent]
  • September 01, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • September 01, 2020: [Brief /Other]
  • September 01, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • September 01, 2020: [Amended Complaint]
August, 2020
  • August 31, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • August 21, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • August 20, 2020: [Brief /Other]
  • August 20, 2020: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • August 20, 2020: [Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal]
  • August 13, 2020: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.