U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cv-00027
  • Case Name: Grove v. Iowa Playhouse et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2020
  • November 19, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
  • November 02, 2020: [Notice - Other]
  • November 02, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
October, 2020
  • October 22, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
  • October 15, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • October 08, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest PLAINTIFF]
  • October 01, 2020: [Certify Class]
September, 2020
  • September 30, 2020: [Notice - Other]
  • September 23, 2020: [Notice of Consent]
August, 2020
  • August 24, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 24, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • August 14, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • August 13, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.