U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-cv-00065
  • Case Name: Moothart v. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2020
  • October 05, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
September, 2020
  • September 28, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • September 14, 2020: [Remand to State Court]
August, 2020
  • August 20, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • August 20, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
  • August 19, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • August 18, 2020: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.