U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:20-cv-04041
  • Case Name: Sanborn Savings Bank v. Freed
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 13, 2021: [Leave to File Document]
June, 2021
  • June 22, 2021: [File Overlength Brief]
  • June 17, 2021: [File Overlength Brief]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: [Continue]
  • April 19, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
September, 2020
  • September 23, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
August, 2020
  • August 18, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.