U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00262
  • Case Name: Paxton v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 04, 2022: [Judgment]
  • August 03, 2022: [Order]
December, 2020
  • December 22, 2020: [Plaintiffs Reply Brief - Social Security Cases]
October, 2020
  • October 26, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • October 07, 2020: [Affidavit]
  • October 06, 2020: [Response to 2255 Motion to Vacate]
  • October 06, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
August, 2020
  • August 26, 2020: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • August 25, 2020: [Initial Review Order]
  • August 19, 2020: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence - 2255]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.