U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00274
  • Case Name: Elevated Industry, LLC v. Society Insurance
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2020
  • October 15, 2020: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • October 15, 2020: [Notice - Other]
  • October 15, 2020: [Brief /Other]
  • October 12, 2020: [Stay]
September, 2020
  • September 30, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • September 22, 2020: [Summary Judgment]
  • September 21, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest PLAINTIFF]
  • September 21, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • September 21, 2020: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • September 08, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • September 08, 2020: [Amended Complaint]
  • September 08, 2020: [Errata]
  • September 04, 2020: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • September 01, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
August, 2020
  • August 31, 2020: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.