U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cv-00028
  • Case Name: Wantoe et al v. Archibald et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2021
  • May 10, 2021: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • May 07, 2021: [Notice of Stipulated Dismissal]
April, 2021
  • April 19, 2021: [Closing Documents]
  • April 19, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 19, 2021: [Status Conference]
January, 2021
  • January 08, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • January 07, 2021: [Protective Order]
November, 2020
  • November 23, 2020: [Order]
  • November 23, 2020: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • November 23, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 23, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • November 23, 2020: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • November 22, 2020: [Order]
  • November 19, 2020: [Scheduling Conference]
  • November 17, 2020: [Errata]
  • November 16, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • November 10, 2020: [Order]
  • November 10, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • November 08, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
September, 2020
  • September 21, 2020: [Jury Demand]
  • September 15, 2020: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • September 09, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • September 04, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • September 03, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.