U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-cv-00075
  • Case Name: Contitech USA, Inc. v. McLaughlin Freight Services, Inc., et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 08, 2024: [Notice of Supreme Court Filing]
April, 2022
  • April 15, 2022: [Reply]
  • April 13, 2022: [File Overlength Brief]
  • April 11, 2022: [Transcript]
  • April 06, 2022: [Reply]
  • April 05, 2022: [Order]
  • April 04, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Errata]
  • March 30, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • March 28, 2022: [Transcript]
  • March 23, 2022: [Sealed Document]
  • March 23, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • March 22, 2022: [Leave to File Under Seal]
  • March 19, 2022: [Transcript]
  • March 17, 2022: [Leave to File Under Seal]
  • March 17, 2022: [LR 83E Exhibits]
  • March 16, 2022: [Alter Judgment]
  • March 16, 2022: [Judgment as a Matter of Law]
  • March 16, 2022: [Objections to Bill of Costs]
  • March 02, 2022: [Bill of Costs]
February, 2022
  • February 16, 2022: [Judgment]
  • February 14, 2022: [Transcript]
  • February 13, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • February 12, 2022: [Witness List]
  • February 12, 2022: [Jury Verdict]
  • February 12, 2022: [Sealed Document]
  • February 12, 2022: [Jury Question]
  • February 12, 2022: [Jury Instructions]
  • February 11, 2022: [Jury Trial - Completed]
  • February 11, 2022: [Sealed Document]
  • February 10, 2022: [Jury Trial - Held]
  • February 10, 2022: [Sealed Document]
  • February 09, 2022: [Jury Trial - Held]
  • February 08, 2022: [Jury Trial - Held]
  • February 07, 2022: [Jury Trial - Begun]
  • February 07, 2022: [Pretrial Conference - Interim]
  • February 07, 2022: [Jury Instructions]
  • February 07, 2022: [Jury Challenge Sheet (Sealed)]
  • February 04, 2022: [Sealed Document]
  • February 04, 2022: [Motion in Limine]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • January 28, 2022: [In Limine]
  • January 27, 2022: [Motion in Limine]
  • January 25, 2022: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • January 21, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 20, 2022: [Order]
  • January 20, 2022: [Pretrial Conference - Final]
  • January 18, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 18, 2022: [Statement]
  • January 18, 2022: [Proposed Pretrial Order]
  • January 18, 2022: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • January 18, 2022: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • January 18, 2022: [Trial Brief]
  • January 14, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • January 12, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • January 12, 2022: [Reply]
  • January 06, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
  • January 05, 2022: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • January 05, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • January 05, 2022: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [In Limine]
  • December 22, 2021: [Witness List]
  • December 22, 2021: [Exhibit List]
November, 2021
  • November 24, 2021: [Compel]
  • November 04, 2021: [Order]
October, 2021
  • October 15, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: [Reply]
  • September 29, 2021: [File Overlength Brief]
  • September 27, 2021: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • September 27, 2021: [Counterclaim]
  • September 24, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • September 22, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • September 22, 2021: [File Overlength Brief]
  • September 15, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • September 09, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
  • September 08, 2021: [Leave to File]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • August 27, 2021: [Reply]
  • August 26, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • August 20, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
  • August 13, 2021: [Compel]
July, 2021
  • July 26, 2021: [Telephone Conference]
  • July 19, 2021: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • July 19, 2021: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
  • July 06, 2021: [Reply]
June, 2021
  • June 28, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • June 21, 2021: [Leave]
May, 2021
  • May 28, 2021: [Strike]
  • May 27, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • May 18, 2021: [Strike]
  • May 04, 2021: [Status Conference]
April, 2021
  • April 20, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 06, 2021: [Amended Answer to Complaint]
  • April 05, 2021: [Leave to File]
  • April 02, 2021: [Leave]
March, 2021
  • March 25, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • March 24, 2021: [Protective Order]
December, 2020
  • December 18, 2020: [Order]
  • December 18, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • December 18, 2020: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • December 18, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 17, 2020: [Scheduling Conference]
  • December 17, 2020: [Errata]
  • December 14, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • December 14, 2020: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • December 02, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
November, 2020
  • November 25, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 25, 2020: [Order]
  • November 25, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • November 23, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
  • November 23, 2020: [Counterclaim]
  • November 17, 2020: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • November 16, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • November 02, 2020: [Waiver of Service Executed]
October, 2020
  • October 06, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest PLAINTIFF]
September, 2020
  • September 17, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.