U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00302
  • Case Name: Hannoon v. Walmart, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 24, 2021: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • November 23, 2021: [Stipulation]
  • November 03, 2021: [Notice - Other]
May, 2021
  • May 04, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • May 03, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
April, 2021
  • April 22, 2021: [Status Conference]
January, 2021
  • January 13, 2021: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • January 12, 2021: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
November, 2020
  • November 25, 2020: [Protective Order]
  • November 24, 2020: [Protective Order]
October, 2020
  • October 23, 2020: [Scheduling Conference]
  • October 14, 2020: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • October 14, 2020: [Order]
  • October 14, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • October 13, 2020: [Order]
  • October 13, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • October 06, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • October 06, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
  • October 02, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • October 01, 2020: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.