U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:20-cv-02042
  • Case Name: Scully v. Bertch Cabinet Mfg Inc et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2021
  • January 12, 2021: [Default Judgment]
  • January 11, 2021: [Default Judgment]
December, 2020
  • December 07, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • December 03, 2020: [Default Entry]
October, 2020
  • October 02, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 01, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • October 01, 2020: [UNRESISTED Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.