U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00305
  • Case Name: Cox v. Doggie Dude Ranch, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2021
  • February 02, 2021: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • February 01, 2021: [Stipulation]
January, 2021
  • January 08, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • January 05, 2021: [Protective Order]
November, 2020
  • November 13, 2020: [Order]
  • November 13, 2020: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • November 13, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • November 13, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 12, 2020: [Scheduling Conference]
  • November 09, 2020: [Errata]
  • November 05, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
October, 2020
  • October 30, 2020: [Order]
  • October 30, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • October 08, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • October 06, 2020: [Report Regarding Patent & Trademark]
  • October 06, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • October 05, 2020: [Copyright/Patent/Trademark Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.