U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-cv-00080
  • Case Name: Ohlensehlen et al v. The University of Iowa
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Notice - Other]
  • October 15, 2021: [Release of Funds]
  • October 14, 2021: [Release of Funds]
  • October 07, 2021: [Judgment]
  • October 06, 2021: [Release of Funds]
  • October 01, 2021: [Release of Funds]
September, 2021
  • September 09, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • September 08, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • September 03, 2021: [Sealed Document]
August, 2021
  • August 25, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • August 24, 2021: [Stay]
  • August 20, 2021: [Stay]
July, 2021
  • July 22, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • July 21, 2021: [Order]
  • July 21, 2021: [Compel]
  • July 20, 2021: [Compel]
June, 2021
  • June 16, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
April, 2021
  • April 14, 2021: [Release of Funds]
  • April 07, 2021: [Order]
  • April 07, 2021: [Protective Order]
March, 2021
  • March 26, 2021: [Reply]
  • March 24, 2021: [Order]
  • March 24, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • March 24, 2021: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • March 24, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 24, 2021: [Scheduling Conference]
  • March 19, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • March 19, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • March 10, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • March 09, 2021: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • March 05, 2021: [Release of Funds]
  • March 02, 2021: [USCA Mandate]
  • March 02, 2021: [USCA Opinion/Judgment]
  • March 01, 2021: [Transcript]
February, 2021
  • February 23, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
January, 2021
  • January 29, 2021: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • January 29, 2021: [USCA Case Number]
  • January 27, 2021: [Notification of Appeal to USCA]
  • January 22, 2021: [Notice of Cross Appeal]
  • January 22, 2021: [Notice of Interlocutory Appeal]
  • January 15, 2021: [Reply]
  • January 12, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • January 08, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • January 07, 2021: [Bond]
  • January 04, 2021: [Order]
December, 2020
  • December 29, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • December 24, 2020: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • December 23, 2020: [Affidavit]
  • December 22, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • December 22, 2020: [Affidavit]
  • December 22, 2020: [Order]
  • December 18, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • December 18, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • December 18, 2020: [Affidavit]
  • December 17, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • December 17, 2020: [Reply]
  • December 17, 2020: [Brief /Other]
  • December 17, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 16, 2020: [File Overlength Brief]
  • December 15, 2020: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • December 15, 2020: [File Overlength Brief]
  • December 14, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • December 14, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 13, 2020: [File Overlength Brief]
  • December 08, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • December 07, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • December 07, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • December 07, 2020: [Order]
  • December 04, 2020: [Order]
  • December 04, 2020: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • December 04, 2020: [File Overlength Brief]
  • December 03, 2020: [File Overlength Brief]
October, 2020
  • October 20, 2020: [Amended Complaint]
  • October 19, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
  • October 19, 2020: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • October 15, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
  • October 08, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 05, 2020: [Waiver of Service Executed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.