U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:20-cv-02079
  • Case Name: Fernandez v. Tyson Foods, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2021
  • January 08, 2021: [Stay]
December, 2020
  • December 23, 2020: [Expedite]
  • December 22, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • December 22, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
  • December 22, 2020: [Stay]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [Extension of Time for Scheduling Order Deadlines]
  • November 18, 2020: [UNRESISTED Motion]
  • November 05, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 04, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 02, 2020: [Remand]
October, 2020
  • October 30, 2020: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • October 09, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 06, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.