U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00307
  • Case Name: McNeal et al v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2020
  • November 17, 2020: [Letter]
  • November 16, 2020: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • November 16, 2020: [Order on Motion to Remand to State Court]
  • November 13, 2020: [Remand to State Court]
  • November 13, 2020: [Stipulation]
  • November 10, 2020: [Order]
  • November 10, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
October, 2020
  • October 15, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • October 13, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
  • October 13, 2020: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • October 07, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.