U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00310
  • Case Name: Iowa Regional Utilities Association v. City of Pella, Iowa
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 20, 2021: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • August 19, 2021: [Notice of Stipulated Dismissal]
  • August 12, 2021: [Status Report]
July, 2021
  • July 09, 2021: [Status Report]
June, 2021
  • June 08, 2021: [Status Report]
May, 2021
  • May 28, 2021: [Errata]
  • May 27, 2021: [Notice - Other]
  • May 27, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • May 07, 2021: [Status Report Order]
  • May 07, 2021: [Status Report]
April, 2021
  • April 14, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • April 09, 2021: [Stay]
  • April 07, 2021: [Stay]
March, 2021
  • March 23, 2021: [Notice of Change of Address]
February, 2021
  • February 24, 2021: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
  • February 17, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • February 12, 2021: [Errata]
  • February 11, 2021: [Protective Order]
December, 2020
  • December 07, 2020: [Order]
  • December 07, 2020: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • December 07, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
November, 2020
  • November 12, 2020: [Order]
  • November 12, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 12, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • November 12, 2020: [Scheduling Conference]
  • November 12, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • November 10, 2020: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • November 09, 2020: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
October, 2020
  • October 30, 2020: [Order]
  • October 30, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • October 21, 2020: [Continue]
  • October 20, 2020: [Continue]
  • October 15, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 15, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • October 15, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 15, 2020: [Order]
  • October 14, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 08, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • October 07, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.