U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00312
  • Case Name: Maudlin-Hiatt v. Commissioner of Social Security
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 03, 2022: [Attorney Fees]
  • January 03, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • January 03, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
December, 2021
  • December 20, 2021: [Attorney Fees]
September, 2021
  • September 24, 2021: [Judgment]
  • September 23, 2021: [Order on Motion to Remand to Agency]
  • September 22, 2021: [Remand to Agency]
July, 2021
  • July 25, 2021: [Plaintiffs Brief - Social Security Cases]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Social Security Briefing Schedule Order]
  • May 21, 2021: [Transcript - Social Security]
  • May 21, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
March, 2021
  • March 24, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
January, 2021
  • January 26, 2021: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • January 26, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
December, 2020
  • December 30, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
October, 2020
  • October 13, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • October 13, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 12, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • October 09, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.