U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00321
  • Case Name: Tuggle v. Wells Fargo Home Mortgage et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2021
  • February 01, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
January, 2021
  • January 13, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • January 13, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 12, 2021: [UNRESISTED Motion]
  • January 11, 2021: [UNRESISTED Motion]
  • January 11, 2021: [Stipulation]
December, 2020
  • December 22, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 22, 2020: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • December 03, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
November, 2020
  • November 24, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • November 23, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • November 18, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • November 12, 2020: [Order]
  • November 11, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • November 10, 2020: [Stipulation]
  • November 10, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • November 04, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • November 02, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
October, 2020
  • October 23, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 23, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • October 22, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 22, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • October 21, 2020: [Summons Issued]
  • October 19, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • October 16, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.