U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00320
  • Case Name: Miljas v. Greg Cohen Promotions, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2024
  • September 26, 2024: [Judgment]
  • September 26, 2024: [Attorney Fees]
  • September 26, 2024: [Judgment as a Matter of Law]
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 23, 2023: [Motion in Limine]
  • January 13, 2023: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 12, 2023: [Order]
  • January 11, 2023: [Pretrial Conference - Final]
  • January 09, 2023: [Reply]
  • January 08, 2023: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • January 08, 2023: [Statement of the Case]
  • January 06, 2023: [Proposed Pretrial Order]
  • January 06, 2023: [Statement of the Case]
  • January 06, 2023: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • January 06, 2023: [Trial Brief]
  • January 06, 2023: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • January 03, 2023: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • December 27, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • December 21, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 20, 2022: [In Limine]
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [Sanctions]
  • August 23, 2022: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • August 19, 2022: [Status Report]
  • August 17, 2022: [Sanctions]
  • August 15, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
  • August 10, 2022: [In Limine]
  • August 10, 2022: [Witness List]
  • August 10, 2022: [Exhibit List]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • June 17, 2022: [Status Report]
  • June 09, 2022: [Notice - Other]
May, 2022
  • May 16, 2022: [Reply]
  • May 09, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • May 05, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
April, 2022
  • April 12, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 01, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
March, 2022
  • March 23, 2022: [Status Report]
January, 2022
  • January 17, 2022: [Status Report]
  • January 07, 2022: [Continue]
  • January 04, 2022: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
December, 2021
  • December 27, 2021: [Status Report]
  • December 16, 2021: [Certificate of Service]
  • December 14, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • December 14, 2021: [Compel]
  • December 08, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
  • December 06, 2021: [Reply]
  • December 03, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 03, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • December 02, 2021: [Notice - Other]
November, 2021
  • November 16, 2021: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
  • November 16, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • November 16, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • November 15, 2021: [Compel]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • October 27, 2021: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
August, 2021
  • August 06, 2021: [Order]
  • August 06, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • August 06, 2021: [Scheduling Conference]
  • August 05, 2021: [Continue]
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • July 29, 2021: [Order]
  • July 28, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • July 23, 2021: [Notice of Dismissal R16/Service - Clerk]
  • July 14, 2021: [Strike]
  • July 14, 2021: [Show Cause]
  • July 13, 2021: [Reply]
  • July 12, 2021: [USCA Mandate]
  • July 12, 2021: [USCA Opinion/Judgment]
  • July 06, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
June, 2021
  • June 17, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • June 16, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • June 11, 2021: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • June 09, 2021: [Show Cause]
  • June 08, 2021: [Strike]
  • June 02, 2021: [Documents Sent]
May, 2021
  • May 28, 2021: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • May 27, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • May 26, 2021: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • May 26, 2021: [USCA Case Number]
  • May 26, 2021: [Notification of Appeal to USCA]
  • May 25, 2021: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • May 25, 2021: [Third Party Complaint]
  • May 25, 2021: [Counterclaim]
  • May 24, 2021: [Notice of Appeal]
  • May 11, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
  • May 05, 2021: [Bond]
  • May 03, 2021: [Order]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • April 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • April 30, 2021: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • April 26, 2021: [Reply]
  • April 26, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • April 20, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • April 19, 2021: [Brief /Other]
  • April 12, 2021: [Transcript]
  • April 10, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 08, 2021: [Errata]
  • April 08, 2021: [Brief /Other]
  • April 07, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
March, 2021
  • March 17, 2021: [Setting Hearing on Motion]
  • March 10, 2021: [Reply]
  • March 04, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
February, 2021
  • February 16, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
  • February 16, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • February 15, 2021: [Reply]
  • February 15, 2021: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
  • February 12, 2021: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • February 12, 2021: [Show Cause]
  • February 12, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 11, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 11, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • February 03, 2021: [Setting Hearing on Motion]
January, 2021
  • January 11, 2021: [Reply]
  • January 04, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
December, 2020
  • December 28, 2020: [Order]
  • December 22, 2020: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • December 21, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • December 17, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • December 10, 2020: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • December 10, 2020: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • December 09, 2020: [Errata]
November, 2020
  • November 02, 2020: [Waiver of Service Executed]
October, 2020
  • October 30, 2020: [Order]
  • October 18, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.