U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-cv-03042
  • Case Name: North Star Mutual Insurance Company v. Lipps
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 12, 2022: [Continue Trial]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [UNRESISTED Motion]
March, 2022
  • March 16, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 16, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • March 04, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
  • March 01, 2022: [Extension of Time for Scheduling Order Deadlines]
February, 2022
  • February 01, 2022: [UNRESISTED Motion]
November, 2021
  • November 18, 2021: [Extension of Time for Scheduling Order Deadlines]
  • November 18, 2021: [UNRESISTED Motion]
August, 2021
  • August 19, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • August 16, 2021: [Extension of Time for Scheduling Order Deadlines]
  • August 16, 2021: [UNRESISTED Motion]
  • August 12, 2021: [Seal Document]
June, 2021
  • June 09, 2021: [UNRESISTED Motion]
  • June 02, 2021: [Extension of Time for Scheduling Order Deadlines]
  • June 02, 2021: [UNRESISTED Motion]
October, 2020
  • October 21, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.