U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00325
  • Case Name: Kool Storage, LLC v. Integrity Property and Casualty Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 25, 2023: [Terminate Civil Case]
November, 2022
  • November 16, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 16, 2022: [Closing Documents]
  • November 16, 2022: [Settlement Conference]
October, 2022
  • October 12, 2022: [Order]
  • October 12, 2022: [~Util - Set Hearings]
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [Partial Summary Judgment]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
June, 2022
  • June 07, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Hearing/Oral Argument]
April, 2022
  • April 07, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • April 04, 2022: [Status Report]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • February 04, 2022: [Order]
  • February 04, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 03, 2022: [Status Report]
November, 2021
  • November 04, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • November 03, 2021: [Amended Document - NOT Motion]
  • November 02, 2021: [Status Report]
  • November 01, 2021: [Partial Summary Judgment]
October, 2021
  • October 21, 2021: [Order]
  • October 21, 2021: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
July, 2021
  • July 08, 2021: [Stay]
  • July 08, 2021: [Status Conference]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Order]
  • June 30, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • June 29, 2021: [Stay]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • May 04, 2021: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • May 04, 2021: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
  • May 04, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • May 04, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
April, 2021
  • April 28, 2021: [Status Report]
February, 2021
  • February 10, 2021: [Order]
  • February 10, 2021: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • February 10, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • February 08, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • February 01, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
December, 2020
  • December 18, 2020: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • December 07, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • December 04, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
November, 2020
  • November 17, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • November 12, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest PLAINTIFF]
  • November 06, 2020: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
  • November 06, 2020: [Amended Complaint]
October, 2020
  • October 26, 2020: [Errata]
  • October 26, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • October 23, 2020: [Show Cause]
  • October 22, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • October 21, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.