U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00041
  • Case Name: Hansen v. Heinricy
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2021
  • March 02, 2021: [USCA Mandate]
February, 2021
  • February 09, 2021: [USCA Opinion/Judgment]
December, 2020
  • December 07, 2020: [Appeal Remark]
  • December 01, 2020: [USCA Order]
  • December 01, 2020: [USCA Case Number]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [Notification of Appeal to USCA]
  • November 25, 2020: [Notice of Appeal]
October, 2020
  • October 30, 2020: [Judgment]
  • October 26, 2020: [Response to Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • October 23, 2020: [Objection to Report and Recommendations]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.