U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00327
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Three Mercedes-Benz Vehicles Purchased by the Jeffrey Allan Kock Trust a.k.a. the Jeffrey Allan Kock Living Trust
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 28, 2021: [Mail Returned]
  • June 21, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 14, 2021: [Notice - Other]
  • June 10, 2021: [Mail Returned]
  • June 03, 2021: [Order]
May, 2021
  • May 04, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • May 03, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
April, 2021
  • April 20, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • April 20, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • April 05, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2020
  • December 28, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
  • December 09, 2020: [Notice - Other]
  • December 01, 2020: [Notice - Other]
November, 2020
  • November 18, 2020: [Errata]
  • November 17, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • November 17, 2020: [Notice - Other]
  • November 16, 2020: [Certificate of Service]
  • November 03, 2020: [Writ Returned]
October, 2020
  • October 26, 2020: [Issuance of Warrant in rem]
  • October 23, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.