U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00332
  • Case Name: Hill v. Seaboard Foods of Iowa, L.L.C. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 10, 2023: [Notice of Appearance]
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • November 16, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
March, 2022
  • March 18, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
February, 2022
  • February 21, 2022: [Notice - Other]
December, 2021
  • December 01, 2021: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
November, 2021
  • November 19, 2021: [Status Report]
  • November 12, 2021: [Order]
  • November 12, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • November 05, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • November 04, 2021: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
September, 2021
  • September 03, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • September 02, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
June, 2021
  • June 15, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • June 11, 2021: [Order]
  • June 11, 2021: [Status Report]
  • June 02, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • May 21, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 18, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
March, 2021
  • March 25, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
February, 2021
  • February 08, 2021: [Order]
  • February 08, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • February 04, 2021: [Status Report]
January, 2021
  • January 29, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • January 28, 2021: [Protective Order]
December, 2020
  • December 07, 2020: [Order]
  • December 07, 2020: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • December 07, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • December 02, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
November, 2020
  • November 24, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 24, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • November 02, 2020: [Statement]
  • November 02, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
October, 2020
  • October 30, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.