U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00335
  • Case Name: U.S. Department of Labor v. Cazarezz Corporation et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Certificate]
December, 2021
  • December 13, 2021: [Entry of Consent Judgment]
  • December 07, 2021: [Errata]
  • December 07, 2021: [Entry of Consent Judgment]
November, 2021
  • November 09, 2021: [Status Report]
October, 2021
  • October 07, 2021: [Closing Documents]
  • October 07, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • October 07, 2021: [Settlement Conference]
September, 2021
  • September 13, 2021: [Order]
August, 2021
  • August 19, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
July, 2021
  • July 19, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • July 14, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • July 01, 2021: [Status Conference]
June, 2021
  • June 16, 2021: [Order]
  • June 16, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
March, 2021
  • March 18, 2021: [Order]
  • March 18, 2021: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • March 18, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • March 16, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • March 11, 2021: [Notice of Dismissal R16/Service - Clerk]
  • March 03, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 02, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
February, 2021
  • February 22, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
December, 2020
  • December 30, 2020: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • December 10, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • December 08, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
October, 2020
  • October 29, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.